WA HB2282 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a grant program for converting unused public buildings to housing for homeless persons.
Title
Creating a grant program for converting unused public buildings to housing for homeless persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2019-12-31 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2282&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2282.pdf |