WA HB2283 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing fairness, transparency, and accountability in the admission processes of state universities.
Title
Increasing fairness, transparency, and accountability in the admission processes of state universities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-29 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2019-12-31 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2283&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2283.pdf |