WA HB2293 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting election security information from public records disclosure.
Title
Exempting election security information from public records disclosure.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6285 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-14 - First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.