WA HB2295 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning enforcement of small claims court judgments.
Title
Concerning enforcement of small claims court judgments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 25, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-17 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |