WA HB2300 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing marijuana retailers to sell cannabidiol products.
Title
Authorizing marijuana retailers to sell cannabidiol products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6269 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-23 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2300&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2300.pdf |