WA HB2304 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning marijuana processing and retail licenses.
Title
Concerning marijuana processing and retail licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-02 | House | Chapter 192, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2014-03-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-03-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-03 | House | OVER - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | OVER - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
SB6160 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.