WA HB2306 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating legal service contractors.
Title
Regulating legal service contractors.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-31 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6146 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.