WA HB2321 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing youth access to products intended for consumption only by adults age twenty-one and over.
Title
Reducing youth access to products intended for consumption only by adults age twenty-one and over.
Sponsors
Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] |
Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6333 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-03 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2321&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2321.pdf |