WA HB2325 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making 2019-2021 fiscal biennium supplemental operating appropriations.
Title
Making 2019-2021 fiscal biennium supplemental operating appropriations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6168 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-03 - Effective date 4/3/2020.