WA HB2326 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reporting end-of-life care policies.
Title
Reporting end-of-life care policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-01-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |