WA HB2341 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the retirement strategy funds in the plan 3 and the deferred compensation programs.
Title
Concerning the retirement strategy funds in the plan 3 and the deferred compensation programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-30 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6383 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2341&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2341.pdf |