WA HB2343 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning urban housing supply.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning urban housing supply.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-27HouseChapter 173, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-27HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-11HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-10SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-07HousePassed final passage; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-03SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-03SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-03SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-28SenateHSA - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 8:30 AM.
2020-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability.
2020-02-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-02-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-16House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-01-30HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-01-28HouseENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2020-01-09HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB6334 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2343&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2343.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2343-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2343-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2343-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120931&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-16-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2343&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120931&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2343&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120931&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2343&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback