WA HB2345 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning continuing care retirement communities.
Title
Concerning continuing care retirement communities.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-01-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |