WA HB2348 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Streamlining reporting for recipients of housing-related state funding by removing Washington state quality award program requirements.
Title
Streamlining reporting for recipients of housing-related state funding by removing Washington state quality award program requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-23 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6229 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.