WA HB2352 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the building for the arts program.
Title
Concerning the building for the arts program.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] |
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2020-01-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |