WA HB2354 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-08 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-08 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expediting professional licenses for new Washington residents.
Title
Expediting professional licenses for new Washington residents.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] |
Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-28 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |