WA HB2360 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the sharps waste stewardship program.
Title
Establishing the sharps waste stewardship program.
Sponsors
Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2360&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2360.pdf |