WA HB2367 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning subscription service legal defense funds.
Title
Concerning subscription service legal defense funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Hoff [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6043 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2367&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2367.pdf |