WA HB2374 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Preserving the ability of auto dealers to offer consumers products not supplied by an auto manufacturer.
Title
Preserving the ability of auto dealers to offer consumers products not supplied by an auto manufacturer.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] |
Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | House | Chapter 174, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 12:00 PM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-24 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 9:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6340 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.