WA HB2380 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the home care agency vendor rate and repealing electronic timekeeping.
Title
Changing the home care agency vendor rate and repealing electronic timekeeping.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020*. |
2020-04-03 | House | Chapter 336, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-27 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6249 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-14 - First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.