WA HB2383 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring default beverages for children's meals.
Title
Requiring default beverages for children's meals.
Sponsors
Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] |
Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6455 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.