WA HB2384 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the property tax exemption for nonprofit organizations providing rental housing or mobile home park spaces to qualifying households.
Title
Concerning the property tax exemption for nonprofit organizations providing rental housing or mobile home park spaces to qualifying households.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-02 | House | Chapter 273, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6232 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.