WA HB2387 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the exposure of public school students and school personnel to diesel emissions from school bus engines.
Title
Limiting the exposure of public school students and school personnel to diesel emissions from school bus engines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-06 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |