WA HB2396 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the regulation of bot communication on public-facing internet web sites.
Title
Concerning the regulation of bot communication on public-facing internet web sites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-24 | House | ITED - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |