WA HB2397 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Medal of Honor special license plates.
Title
Concerning Medal of Honor special license plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-02 | House | Chapter 181, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2014-03-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB6150 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.