WA HB2405 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning commercial property assessed clean energy and resilience.
Title
Concerning commercial property assessed clean energy and resilience.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 27, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-18 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6222 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.