WA HB2409 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 9/1/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 9/1/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning industrial insurance employer penalties, duties, and the licensing of third-party administrators.
Title
Concerning industrial insurance employer penalties, duties, and the licensing of third-party administrators.
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | House | Effective date 9/1/2020*. |
2020-04-02 | House | Chapter 277, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 57; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |