WA HB2412 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning domestic brewery and microbrewery retail licenses.
Title
Concerning domestic brewery and microbrewery retail licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | House | Chapter 230, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 83; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 12:00 PM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-28 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |