WA HB2415 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-08 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-08 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Conforming elections for certain special districts with Title 29A RCW.
Title
Conforming elections for certain special districts with Title 29A RCW.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |