WA HB2417 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning individuals serving community custody terms.
Title
Concerning individuals serving community custody terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-19 | House | Chapter 82, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-30 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6369 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.