WA HB2419 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Studying barriers to the use of the Washington death with dignity act.
Title
Studying barriers to the use of the Washington death with dignity act.
Sponsors
Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] |
Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | House | Governor vetoed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |