WA HB2421 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state reimbursement of election costs.
Title
Concerning state reimbursement of election costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | House | Effective date 7/1/2021. |
2020-04-03 | House | Chapter 337, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate insists on its position and asks House to concur. |
2020-03-07 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |