WA HB2424 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the heating oil insurance program.
Title
Concerning the heating oil insurance program.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Richard DeBolt [R] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | CB - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment & Energy. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2020-01-23 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6256 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.