WA HB2437 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning voting accessibility and security.
Title
Concerning voting accessibility and security.
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |