WA HB2441 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Improving access to temporary assistance for needy families.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving access to temporary assistance for needy families.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseEffective date 7/1/2021.
2020-04-03HouseChapter 338, 2020 Laws.
2020-04-03HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-11HousePassed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-25SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-25SenateHSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2020-02-14HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-14HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-14House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-14HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-11HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-11HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-11HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-01-24HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-24HouseHSEL - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-24HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2441&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2441.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2441-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2441-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2441-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121099&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-14-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2441&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121099&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2441&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121099&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-11-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2441&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback