WA HB2442 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating online services and applications that are directed at minors.
Title
Regulating online services and applications that are directed at minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-24 | House | ITED - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |