WA HB2446 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the disclosure of personal information held by the department of licensing.
Title
Limiting the disclosure of personal information held by the department of licensing.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] |
Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |