WA HB2456 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning working connections child care eligibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning working connections child care eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage without Senate Amendments (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02HouseEffective date 7/1/2020.
2020-04-02HouseChapter 279, 2020 Laws.
2020-04-02HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-10SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-10SenateSenate receded from amendments.
2020-03-07HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
2020-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-24SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-21SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-21SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-21SenateEDU - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-21SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2020-02-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-13House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-08HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-01-24HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-24HouseHSEL - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-24HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-22HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.

Same As/Similar To

SB6351 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2456&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2456.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2456-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2456-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2456-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121118&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-13-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2456&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121118&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2456&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121118&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2456&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback