WA HB2457 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the health care cost transparency board.
Title
Establishing the health care cost transparency board.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-03 | House | Chapter 340, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 67; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-06 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |