WA HB2467 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a centralized single point of contact background check system for firearms transfers.
Title
Establishing a centralized single point of contact background check system for firearms transfers.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew Hansen [D] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] |
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 28, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-13 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-08 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |