WA HB2471 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning working connections child care payment authorizations.
Title
Concerning working connections child care payment authorizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Chris Corry [R] |
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-28 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6540 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-03 - Effective date 1/1/2021.