WA HB2475 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the underground storage tank reinsurance program.
Title
Concerning the underground storage tank reinsurance program.
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Mead [D] | Rep. Richard DeBolt [R] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-23 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6257 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.