WA HB2486 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the electric marine battery incentive.
Title
Extending the electric marine battery incentive.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | House | Effective date 7/1/2020. |
2020-04-03 | House | Chapter 341, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-03-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-10 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-10 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-10 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6318 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.