WA HB2493 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning captive insurers.
Title
Concerning captive insurers.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-07 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6331 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.