WA HB2498 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing compensation to department of natural resources lessees whose leases are terminated for reasons other than default.
Title
Providing compensation to department of natural resources lessees whose leases are terminated for reasons other than default.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-29 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |