WA HB2502 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning low-proof alcoholic beverages.
Title
Concerning low-proof alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6508 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-20 - First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2502&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2502.pdf |