WA HB2511 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing labor protections for domestic workers.
Title
Providing labor protections for domestic workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 12:00 PM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6247 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.