WA HB2514 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Washington common application.
Title
Creating the Washington common application.
Sponsors
Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] |
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-04 | House | CWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6142 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.