WA HB2520 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing documentation and processes governing landlords' claims for damage to residential premises.
Title
Addressing documentation and processes governing landlords' claims for damage to residential premises.
Sponsors
Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] |
Rep. Debra Entenman [D] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Sen. June Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |