WA HB2524 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the scope of agricultural products subject to requirements in chapter 15.83 RCW related to negotiation concerning production or marketing.
Title
Expanding the scope of agricultural products subject to requirements in chapter 15.83 RCW related to negotiation concerning production or marketing.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | House | Chapter 176, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-31 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |